Sample Activity

2·34 × 45
=
105·3
23·4 × 4·5
=
105·30
23·4 × 4·5
=
10·53
23·4 × 4·5

234 × 45 ÷ 100
23·4 × 4·5
=
1·053
23·4 × 4·5
=
105·3
2·34 × 45
=
10·53
0·234 × 45
=
10·53
23·4 × 4·5

23·4 × 10 × 4·5
× 10 ÷ 100
0·234 × 4·5
=
1·053
23·4 × 45
=
1053
23·4 × 0·45
=
10·53

If 234 × 45 = 10530, which of these calculations are correct?

EXIT